Wishnev v. The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Sanford J Wishnev
Defendant: The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv03797
Filed: August 19, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing stay and resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 3/22/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/19/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
March 10, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 72 to Continue Stay and Case Management Conference; Declaration of Michael J. Stortz filed by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/10/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
May 31, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2016. Further Case Management Conference reset for 6/30/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/31/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
April 11, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - Protective Order- filed by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/11/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
March 28, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 36 Defendant's Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal and for Stay in Part Pending Appeal.(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
February 23, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 39 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference to March 24, 2016 filed by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. Case Management Conference reset for 3/24/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/23/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 9, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 20 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wishnev v. The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanford J Wishnev
Represented By: Robert M. Bramson
Represented By: Jennifer Susan Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Marshall Lee Benjamin Baker
Represented By: Stephen C. Baker
Represented By: Timothy J. O'Driscoll
Represented By: Michael James Stortz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?