Autodesk, Inc. v. Kobayashi + Zedda Architects LTD.

Plaintiff: Autodesk, Inc.
Defendant: Kobayashi + Zedda Architects LTD.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03822
Filed: August 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 42 Stipulation for Dismissal. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2016)
April 22, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/22/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 6, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CMC AND RELATED DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/6/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
March 14, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 19 STIPULATION to set aside default and extend time to respond. Case Management Statement due by 4/28/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/14/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 8, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROCEDURES; ORDER VACATING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/8/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
February 9, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING: 13 Second MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/9/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
November 2, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CMC: Case Management Statement due by 11/19/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/2/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Autodesk, Inc. v. Kobayashi + Zedda Architects LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autodesk, Inc.
Represented By: Eric W. Doney
Represented By: Julie E. Hofer
Represented By: Andrew Scott MacKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kobayashi + Zedda Architects LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?