Collaborative Agreements, LLC v. Adobe Systems Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Collaborative Agreements, LLC
Defendant: Adobe Systems Incorporated, Citrix Systems Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Enterprises LLC, Time Warner Cable Texas LLC, Time Warner Cable Information Systems (Texas) LLC and Time Warner Cable Information Services (Texas) LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv03853
Filed: August 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2017 207 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 206 re 201 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees -Stipulated Request for Order Changing the Time to Renew Adobes Motion for Attorney Fees<by 10/24/17 /i> filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/18/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
April 14, 2016 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 138 Defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication of the '393 Patent's Effective Priority Date and Invalidity. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
February 19, 2016 150 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY DATE TO EXCHANGE EMAIL PRODUCTION REQUESTS granting 148 . Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/19/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
January 15, 2016 144 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 143 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Edward Chin as Counsel for Collaborative Agreements, LLC filed by Collaborative Agreements, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/16/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 11, 2016 140 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 139 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Extend ADR (Settlement Conference) Deadline filed by Collaborative Agreements, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/11/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
December 23, 2015 137 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 136 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Extend Certain Discovery Deadlines filed by Collaborative Agreements, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/23/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 10, 2015 132 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 131 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/10/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 2, 2015 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 93 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
September 23, 2015 110 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/23/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collaborative Agreements, LLC v. Adobe Systems Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collaborative Agreements, LLC
Represented By: Edward K. Chin
Represented By: Edward Kuanhua Chin
Represented By: Robert Winn Cutler
Represented By: Derek T. Gilliland
Represented By: Derek Tod Gilliland
Represented By: Lewis Emery Hudnell, III
Represented By: Christian John Hurt
Represented By: Ross E. Leonoudakis
Represented By: Kirk Austin Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Represented By: David M. Hoffman
Represented By: W. Thomas Jacks
Represented By: Frank E Scherkenbach
Represented By: Neil Warren
Represented By: Neil A Warren
Represented By: Jason W Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citrix Systems Inc.
Represented By: David M. Hoffman
Represented By: W. Thomas Jacks
Represented By: Frank E Scherkenbach
Represented By: Neil Warren
Represented By: Jason W Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable Inc.
Represented By: David M. Hoffman
Represented By: W. Thomas Jacks
Represented By: Frank E Scherkenbach
Represented By: Neil Warren
Represented By: Jason W Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TiVo Inc.
Represented By: David M. Hoffman
Represented By: W. Thomas Jacks
Represented By: Frank E Scherkenbach
Represented By: Neil Warren
Represented By: Jason W Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable Enterprises LLC
Represented By: David M. Hoffman
Represented By: W. Thomas Jacks
Represented By: Frank E Scherkenbach
Represented By: Neil Warren
Represented By: Jason W Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable Texas LLC
Represented By: David M. Hoffman
Represented By: W. Thomas Jacks
Represented By: Frank E Scherkenbach
Represented By: Neil Warren
Represented By: Jason W Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable Information Systems (Texas) LLC
Represented By: David M. Hoffman
Represented By: W. Thomas Jacks
Represented By: Frank E Scherkenbach
Represented By: Neil Warren
Represented By: Jason W Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable Information Services (Texas) LLC
Represented By: David M. Hoffman
Represented By: W. Thomas Jacks
Represented By: Frank E Scherkenbach
Represented By: Neil Warren
Represented By: Jason W Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?