Asturias et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al

Plaintiff: Elena Asturias and Carlota Del Portillo
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC and Veriprise Processing Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv03861
Filed: August 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2016 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR STAY AND INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/8/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
July 8, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE JUDGMENT AND A NEW TRIAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/8/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
May 23, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg striking plaintiffs' ex parte motion for relief from the judgment and granting the motion for extension of time to file a notice of appeal. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
April 22, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/22/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
January 29, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/29/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
December 4, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/4/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 2, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/2/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
October 30, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 6 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend; denying 15 Motion to Remand. The Court VACATES the hearing set for November 3, 2015. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/30/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asturias et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Asturias
Represented By: Armine Singh
Represented By: Gagik Stepanyan
Represented By: Jack Ter-Saakyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlota Del Portillo
Represented By: Armine Singh
Represented By: Gagik Stepanyan
Represented By: Jack Ter-Saakyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Paese
Represented By: John B. Sullivan
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veriprise Processing Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Paese
Represented By: John B. Sullivan
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?