Roe et al v. Berkeley Unified School District

Plaintiff: John Roe, Jane Roe and Jason Roe
Defendant: Berkeley Unified School District
Case Number: 3:2015cv03871
Filed: August 25, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/16/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
September 2, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: filing documents under seal. Docket numbers 3-12, 19-21, and 23 shall be maintained under seal. The parties shall electronically file redacted versions of these documents on or before 09/11/15. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/02/15. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
September 1, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting preliminary injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/01/15. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
August 31, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: September 1, 2015 hearing. Parties are encouraged to have an IEP meeting to resolve this matter without further litigation. If parties cannot resolve this matter, they shall come to the motion hearing prepared to address the questions in this order. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/31/15. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
August 25, 2015 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Ex Parte Application to Seal Files. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 25, 2015. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roe et al v. Berkeley Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Roe
Represented By: Paul Brian Justi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Roe
Represented By: Paul Brian Justi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Roe
Represented By: Paul Brian Justi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkeley Unified School District
Represented By: Roy Albert Combs
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Mori
Represented By: Jan Ellen Tomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?