Kip Sides v. Cisco Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kip Sides
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc. and United Healthcare
Case Number: 3:2015cv03893
Filed: August 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Cisco Systems, Inc., United Healthcare against Kip Sides.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 165 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Robert Claude Bohner and Edward Albert Stumpp terminated. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 200 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 184 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Dkt. No. 176 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 166 Stipulation to Continue Bench Trial/Motion Hearing and Cross-Motions Deadlines re Docket No. 161 : Cross Motions due by 2/1/2019; Responses due by 2/22/2019; Bench Trial/ Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 158 REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINES. Cross Motions due by 12/13/2018; Responses due by 1/7/2019 and Bench Trial /Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2018)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. (This order Denies docket no. 156 ). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 146 PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY. (This order also terminates docket no. 148 ). Cross Motions due by 8/10/2018; Responses due by 9/7/2018. Bench Trial / Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 136 Motion to Appear by Telephone for Case Management Conference.Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING ( 64 , 68 ) MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND DENYING ( 65 , 66 [MOTIONS TO STRIKE AND FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT. Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2017 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER OF RECUSAL (granting 85 ) by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2016)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING 59 PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER APPROVING 55 STIPULATION TO AMEND COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kip Sides v. Cisco Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kip Sides
Represented By: Laurence Fred Padway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?