STMicroelectronics, Inc. v. Lopez

Plaintiff: STMicroelectronics, Inc.
Defendant: Manuel Lopez
Case Number: 3:2015cv03919
Filed: August 27, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/8/16. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
December 17, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 12 Motion to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
November 6, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 Order Reassigning Case. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/31/2015. Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/6/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STMicroelectronics, Inc. v. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STMicroelectronics, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Bettinger
Represented By: Rachel R. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Lopez
Represented By: Jayson Michael Lorenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?