Gallagher v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.

Plaintiff: Colleen Gallagher
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03952
Filed: August 28, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 46 Administrative Motion TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 3-3, 3-12, AND 7-11. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
April 4, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING NEW PARTIES AND CLAIMS AND DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/4/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
February 25, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 38 Stipulation re Filing of First Amended Complaint and Related Briefing Schedule.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
February 5, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANTS 18 MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
October 22, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 28 Stipulation Regarding Rescheduling of Motion to Dismiss Hearing. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
October 6, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Hall, Donald (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
September 15, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallagher v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Gallagher
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Cavanagh
Represented By: Allison Dodd
Represented By: Sascha Von Mende Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?