PhantomALERT, Inc. v. Google Inc. et al

Plaintiff: PhantomALERT, Inc.
Defendant: Google Inc. and Waze, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03986
Filed: September 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 35 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with leave to amend within 30 days of the date of this order; Defendants' motion to dismiss shall be filed within 30 days of Plaintiff's filing of the second amended complaint.(jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
December 14, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part 19 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing complaint with leave to amend within thirty days. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
September 18, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 17 Stipulation To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Waze, Inc., Google Inc.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/18/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PhantomALERT, Inc. v. Google Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PhantomALERT, Inc.
Represented By: Ansel Jay Halliburton
Represented By: Karl Stephen Kronenberger
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Sonali Deeksha Maitra
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waze, Inc.
Represented By: Sonali Deeksha Maitra
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?