De La Paz v. Bayer AG et al

Plaintiff: Tanya De La Paz
Defendant: Bayer AG, Bayer Corp., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Bayer Essure Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03995
Filed: September 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER by Hon. William Alsup granting 77 Motion to Relate Case.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
July 6, 2017 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT MOTION TO RELATE by Hon. William Alsup denying 75 Administrative Motion Motion to Relate.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
April 7, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER by Hon. William Alsup granting 67 Administrative Motion to relate.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
March 30, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASES by Hon. William Alsup granting 64 Administrative Motion to relate.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017)
June 30, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER by Hon. William Alsup granting 59 Administrative Motion relate.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
February 2, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup granting 33 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
January 14, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/14/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
November 19, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ENLARGING TIME FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANT' MOTION TO DISMISS AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 38 First Ex Parte Application Responses due by 12/21/2015. Replies due by 1/7/2016. Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/19/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 18, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/18/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 17, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASE by Hon. William Alsup granting 35 Motion to Relate Case.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
November 2, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO RELATE CASE NOS. 15-4952 AND 15-4953 TO CASE NO. 15-3995 ***CASES NOT CONSOLIDATED. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/2/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
October 29, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT AND SETTING SCHEDULE FOR RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS, Motions terminated: 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Tanya De La Paz, 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Co mplaint and Notice of Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Corp.. Motions due by 11/9/2015. Replies due by 12/10/2015. Responses due by 11/30/2015. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/29/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 27, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE re 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Tanya De La Paz, 19 Amended Document filed by Tanya De La Paz Responses due by 10/29/2015 at Noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/27/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
September 28, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASES by Hon. William Alsup granting 11 Motion to Relate Case 15-4193.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
September 14, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De La Paz v. Bayer AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corp.
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare LLC
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Essure Inc.
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya De La Paz
Represented By: Martin Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?