Jami Tillotson v. City of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: Jami Tillotson
Defendant: City of San Francisco, Gary Buckner, Douglas Farmer, Brian Stansbury, Patrick Woods, Matthew Eng and Brian Kneuker
Case Number: 3:2015cv04014
Filed: September 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2017 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 57 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 44 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
January 17, 2017 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 45 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 48 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
June 14, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 33 Letter filed by City of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 06/14/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
March 25, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER (As Modified) by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 25 Stipulation to Continue Further Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/25/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jami Tillotson v. City of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jami Tillotson
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Buckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Stansbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Eng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kneuker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?