Bruce Carpenter v. Air New Zealand Limited

Plaintiff: Bruce Carpenter
Defendant: Air New Zealand Limited
Case Number: 3:2015cv04034
Filed: September 3, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/29/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
June 15, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER resetting status. Status Report due by 8/25/2016. Status Conference set for 9/1/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/15/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
May 20, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE ATTENDANCE: AT ENE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/20/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
April 6, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (PROTECTIVE ORDER) filed by Air New Zealand Limited. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/6/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce Carpenter v. Air New Zealand Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Carpenter
Represented By: Richard Boone Callaway
Represented By: Nathaniel M Leeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air New Zealand Limited
Represented By: Scott David Cunningham
Represented By: Michael Cutler
Represented By: Ivy Larsen Nowinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?