UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MILBURN

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: JOHN E. MILBURN
Case Number: 3:2015cv04040
Filed: September 3, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference continued to 12/22/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Counsel for the United States is advised that if service is not perfected by December 22, the case will be subject to dismissal without further notice. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/27/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
May 12, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 5/19/2016 Continued to 6/16/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/12/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
November 3, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Hon. Samuel Conti no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by J Executive Committee on 11/3/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MILBURN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Cynthia Lewis Stier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN E. MILBURN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?