T.K. et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: T.K., Tanya Konaris, Debbie Konaris, Jeamean Redd and Troy Konaris
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Greg Suhr, Steven Uang, Brian Hopkins, "FNU" Burke and Gregory Skaug
Case Number: 3:2015cv04043
Filed: September 3, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE re 40 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal.The Friday, October 14, 2016 at 3:00pm Pre-filing Conference re Summary Judgment is VACATED. The Friday, October 14, 2016 at 3:01pm Order to Show Cause hearing is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/13/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 12, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT'S STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday, 10/14/2016 03:01 PM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/12/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
October 5, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*]. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/5/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
May 18, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2016 is CONTINUED to 10/17/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/18/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
February 12, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/12/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
December 17, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: A Settlement Conference is set for 2/24/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 16, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Non-Expert Discovery due by 9/15/2016. Disclosure of Experts: Opening: 12/1/2016; Rebuttal: 12/15/2016. Expert Discovery Cutoff: 1/15/2017. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/16/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T.K. et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.K.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Hasani Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Konaris
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Hasani Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Konaris
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Hasani Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeamean Redd
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Hasani Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Konaris
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Hasani Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Suhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Uang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "FNU" Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Skaug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?