GreenCycle Paint, Inc. v. PaintCare, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: GreenCycle Paint, Inc.
Defendant: PaintCare, Inc., Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. and Stericycle Environmental Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04059
Filed: September 4, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 89 Stipulation for Protective Order. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
April 11, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 50 , 51 , 52 Motions to Dismiss. Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2017. Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
January 3, 2017 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 69 Motion for Leave to File Reply. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
August 26, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 60 Stipulation For Extension of Time for Defendants to File Replies to Motions to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and to Reset hearing. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
July 1, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 55 Stipulation Resetting Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
April 8, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 , 26 Motions to Dismiss with Leave to Amend. Amended Complaint due by 5/6/2016. Entered by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/8/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
November 12, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Hearing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss; Hearing rescheduled for December 10, 2015. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/12/2015. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GreenCycle Paint, Inc. v. PaintCare, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GreenCycle Paint, Inc.
Represented By: Greggory C. Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PaintCare, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Irene Culp
Represented By: Cody Scott Lonning
Represented By: Thomas Edward Wallerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Michael Downey
Represented By: Eugene Sok Lee
Represented By: Katherine Anna Scott-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stericycle Environmental Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond J. Etcheverry
Represented By: Matthew Schechter
Represented By: Cory D. Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?