Riede et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Barbara Joy Riede and Mike Riede
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2015cv04070
Filed: September 8, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Agreement of Compromise and Settlement re 29 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 06/22/2016. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
February 23, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 25 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/23/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
January 27, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2016 02:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2016 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/27/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riede et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Joy Riede
Represented By: William H. Paynter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Riede
Represented By: William H. Paynter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?