Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. et al v. Lilith Games (Shanghai) Co. Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. and Valve Corporation
Defendant: Lilith Games (Shanghai) Co. Ltd., uCool, Inc. and uCool Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04084
Filed: September 8, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2017 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL re: 208 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/14/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
May 16, 2017 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 120 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 126 Motion for Sanctions. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
March 14, 2017 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 03/14/2017. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
February 7, 2017 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DEFERRING CONSIDERATION OF MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
February 22, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs' Time To Respond to uCool's Motion To Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by uCool, Inc. Reset Deadlines as to 44 MOTION to Dismiss First A mended Complaint. Responses due by 3/1/2016. Replies due by 3/14/2016. Motion Hearing reset for 4/8/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/22/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
December 8, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend by Judge Charles R. Breyer. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
November 18, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS The parties' stipulation is adopted and IT IS SO ORDERED. Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/18/2015. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. et al v. Lilith Games (Shanghai) Co. Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Agar Kohler
Represented By: Marc E. Mayer
Represented By: Karin G. Pagnanelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valve Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Agar Kohler
Represented By: Marc E. Mayer
Represented By: Karin G. Pagnanelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilith Games (Shanghai) Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: uCool, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Francis LaFond
Represented By: Evette Dionna Pennypacker
Represented By: Claude M. Stern
Represented By: Derek J. Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: uCool Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?