Via Licensing Corporation v. Pegatron Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Via Licensing Corporation
Defendant: Pegatron Corporation, Pegatron Technology Service Inc and Unihan Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv04086
Filed: September 8, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/7/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
December 18, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 38 STIPULATION SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Responses due by 1/22/2016. Replies due by 2/5/2016. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/18/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 4, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 21 STIPULATION selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/4/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
November 24, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 19 STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DATES. Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/24/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 17, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/17/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Via Licensing Corporation v. Pegatron Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Via Licensing Corporation
Represented By: Garrard R. Beeney
Represented By: Laura Kabler Oswell
Represented By: Laura R. Paliani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pegatron Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pegatron Technology Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unihan Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?