Ambers et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Brent Ambers and Judith E. Ambers
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., HS Funding Group and Cal Western Reconveyance Corp.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04100
Filed: September 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Re: Dkt. No. 6 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 7, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS HS FUNDING GROUP AND CAL WESTERN RECONVEYANCE CORP. The Court DENIES the Ambers' motion for an extension of time, dkt. no. 26 Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/7/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 1, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Ambers must file proof of service of defendants by 12/4/2015. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/1/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
September 17, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/17/2105. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ambers et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Ambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith E. Ambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HS Funding Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal Western Reconveyance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?