Teespring, Inc. v. Puetz

Plaintiff: Teespring, Inc.
Defendant: Bradley John Puetz
Case Number: 3:2015cv04149
Filed: September 11, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2017 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PRETRIAL MOTIONS by Judge Vince Chhabria. Teespring and Maginnis must e-file the amended answers. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
March 13, 2017 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying 93 , 100 Motions for Summary Judgment; denying 103 , 114 Motions for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
April 22, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 51 Discovery Dispute, filed by Bradley John Puetz. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/22/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teespring, Inc. v. Puetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teespring, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Melissa Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley John Puetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?