Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.210.130.222

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.210.130.222
Case Number: 3:2015cv04175
Filed: September 11, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Hon. William Alsup granting 40 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 11, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ***Corrected*** ORDER GRANTING SEALING MOTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/11/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
March 1, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 26 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
February 5, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/5/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 2, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SEALING MOTION AND EXTENDING DEADLINE TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE, Motions terminated: 21 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Malibu Media, LLC, 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Malibu Media, LLC.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/2/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
January 17, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO SERVE DEFENDANT WITH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2016)
November 23, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/23/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
October 18, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup granting 11 Ex Parte Application.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.210.130.222
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Brenna Elsie Erlbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.210.130.222
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?