Elizabeth Lloyd v. Vipul Gupta et al

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Lloyd
Defendant: Vipul Gupta, Nandita Gupta, Ashok Gupta, Bharat Gupta, Akshay Gupta, 60MonthLoans, Inc. and 9Global Inc
Case Number: 3:2015cv04183
Filed: September 14, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 68 Stipulation re Joint dismissal with prejudice for entry of Final Judgment on all claims and counterclaims in this action. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
July 22, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 44 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Derivative Action Settlement; Final Approval Hearing set for September 8, 2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
May 31, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING ALL PENDING DEADLINES AND HEARINGS. Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement or joint status report due by 7/14/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/31/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 12, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 40 Stipulation to Continue Hearing and Briefing dates on Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
February 18, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/10/2016 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 2/25/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/18/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
January 8, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER:Parties referred to private mediation Deadline to Seek Leave to Amend Pleadings: 4/11/2016Discovery due by 7/5/2016Dispositive Motions due by 8/4/2016Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2016 Jury Trial set for 1/23/2017 Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/8/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
January 5, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING: 23 STIPULATION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer. Amended Pleadings due by 1/12/2016. No chambers copy is required. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/5/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elizabeth Lloyd v. Vipul Gupta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Lloyd
Represented By: Bryan Jacob Ketroser
Represented By: Bahram Seyedin-Noor
Represented By: James Banaban de los Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vipul Gupta
Represented By: Robert Graham Loewy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nandita Gupta
Represented By: Robert Graham Loewy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashok Gupta
Represented By: Robert Graham Loewy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bharat Gupta
Represented By: Robert Graham Loewy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akshay Gupta
Represented By: Robert Graham Loewy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 60MonthLoans, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Graham Loewy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9Global Inc
Represented By: Christopher W Arledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?