Charter Asset Management Fund, L.P. v. Latin Academy Charter School, Inc.

Plaintiff: Charter Asset Management Fund, L.P.
Defendant: Latin Academy Charter School, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04189
Filed: September 14, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Further Case Management Conference is continued to 5/24/2016 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
March 29, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
January 22, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge For Settlement Conference by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charter Asset Management Fund, L.P. v. Latin Academy Charter School, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charter Asset Management Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Brian R. Blackman
Represented By: J.T. Wells Blaxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latin Academy Charter School, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?