A.C.L. Computers and Software, Inc. v. Federal Express Corporation

Plaintiff: A.C.L. Computers and Software, Inc.
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv04202
Filed: September 15, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/13/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 7, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 33 . Show Cause Response due by 6/10/2016. Issued by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 06/07/2016. (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
March 14, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 22 ORDER ORDER GRANTING 10 MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINTAS TO DEFENDANT FEDERALEXPRESS CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/14/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 4, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 10 MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.C.L. Computers and Software, Inc. v. Federal Express Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.C.L. Computers and Software, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew George Watters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: Aaron T Cassat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?