Snyder v. Bank of America, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Pamela Snyder
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Deutsche Bank as Trustee for HVMLT 2006-5 and Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv04228
Filed: September 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER for Jury Trial by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Jury Trial shall begin 9/18/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Pretrial Conference is set for 8/29/2017 02:00 PM. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
June 28, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 51 Motion to Consolidate Cases. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
January 8, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/8/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Snyder
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Britt M. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank as Trustee for HVMLT 2006-5
Represented By: Sara Janett Quinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Sara Janett Quinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?