Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.188.34.4

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.188.34.4
Case Number: 3:2015cv04248
Filed: September 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION AND DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILURE TO TIMELY SERVE DEFENDANT by Hon. William Alsup denying 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 5, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/5/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 3, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SEALING MOTION by Hon. William Alsup granting 20 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
February 2, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
January 17, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO SERVE DEFENDANT WITH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2016)
November 25, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/25/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
October 18, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup granting 9 Ex Parte Application.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.188.34.4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Brenna Elsie Erlbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.188.34.4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?