Fiol v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.

Plaintiff: David Fiol, Benjamin Hall, Matthew Mayerson, Nicholas Benipayo and Robert E. Drury, III
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04278
Filed: September 18, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 7: Order Appointing Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel, Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, and Government Coordinating Counsel. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on January 21, 2016. (crblc4S COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
December 17, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER No. 1 -- Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2015 at 8:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/9/2015. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
November 24, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying cases. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/24/2015. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
October 15, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [REASSIGNED CASES]. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/15/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
September 28, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2015 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/28/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fiol v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Fiol
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Peter B. Fredman
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Hall
Represented By: Joshua Caleb Ezrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Mayerson
Represented By: Pablo Orozco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Benipayo
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Drury, III
Represented By: Daniel Canfield Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Henry Marmolejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?