Bohannon v. Johnson & Johnson, et al

Plaintiff: Latonya Bohannon
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutial Research and Development, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Corporation and McKesson Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv04295
Filed: September 18, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of Minnesota. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
December 2, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/2/2015. ( 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , 22 MOTION to Remand are terminated as moot.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
November 13, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for James F. Murdica. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bohannon v. Johnson & Johnson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latonya Bohannon
Represented By: Ahmed S Diab
Represented By: Sin-Ting Mary Liu
Represented By: Lindsay Rene Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: David C. Allen
Represented By: Sarah Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutial Research and Development, LLC
Represented By: David C. Allen
Represented By: Sarah Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Allen
Represented By: Sarah Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Alicia J. Donahue
Represented By: Amir M Nassihi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: Alicia J. Donahue
Represented By: Amir M Nassihi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: David C. Allen
Represented By: Sarah Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?