City Of Oakland v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: City Of Oakland
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo & Co.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04321
Filed: September 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 151 Defendants' Motion to Amend Order to Include Certification for Interlocutory Appeal. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AMEND re 157 Stipulation. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before J udge Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/30/2018. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 107 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 105 re 104 Amended Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Co. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2017. Initial Case Management Conference/Motion to Dismiss reset for 12/14/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/18/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 100 filed by The City of Oakland Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2017. Further Case Management Conference reset for 11/30/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Hearing set for 11/30/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/15/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 98 extending time to file amended complaint. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/24/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 96 Relating to Amended Complaint filed by The City of Oakland. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/26/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 89 Regarding Case Management Conference filed by The City of Oakland Case Management Statement due by 5/18/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/5/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying Wells Fargo's ex parte request to stay discovery. Re 65 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Co. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/27/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information] filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Co. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/20/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 51 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Co. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/24/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Defendants' Time To Answer Pursuant To Local Civ. Rule 6-2(a) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Co. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/15/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/17/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/16/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER VACATING HEARING AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO RESPOND. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/10/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 26 Stipulation To Amend Briefing Schedule. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015) Modified on 12/8/2015 (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Stipulation to Set Schedule for Motion to Dismiss (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City Of Oakland v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Miriam Kim
Represented By: Joshua Patashnik
Represented By: Terry Edward Sanchez
Represented By: Bart Harper Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Co.
Represented By: Miriam Kim
Represented By: Joshua Patashnik
Represented By: Terry Edward Sanchez
Represented By: Bart Harper Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Of Oakland
Represented By: Sumy Kim
Represented By: Joel Keith Liberson
Represented By: Barbara J. Parker
Represented By: Robert S. Peck
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?