Naruto v. David John Slater et al
Plaintiff: Naruto and Antje Engelhardt
Defendant: Blurb, Inc., David John Slater and Wildlife Personalities, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04324
Filed: September 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER of USCA A judge of the court sua sponte requested a vote on whether to rehear this case en banc. A vote was taken, and the matter failed to receive a majority of the votes of the non-recused judges in favor of en banc consideration. Rehearing en banc is DENIED; as to #48 Notice of Appeal, filed by Naruto (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER of USCA denying rehearing en banc as to #48 Notice of Appeal filed by Naruto. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 56 MANDATE of USCA as to #48 Notice of Appeal, filed by Naruto. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER of USCA A judge has made a sua sponte request for a vote on whether to rehear en banc the published opinion dated April 23,2018. Therefore, the parties are requested to file simultaneous briefs setting forth their respective positions on whether the case should be reheard en banc; as to #48 Notice of Appeal, filed by Naruto (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
April 23, 2018 Filing 54 USCA OPINION; as to #48 Notice of Appeal, filed by Naruto (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER of USCA Defendants-Appellees' request for judicial notice and Competitive Enterprise Institute's motion for leave to file brief as amicus curiae out of time are DENIED; as to #48 Notice of Appeal, filed by Naruto (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER of USCA The joint motion to stay the appeal is granted. This case shall be held in abeyance until September 8,2017; as to #48 Notice of Appeal, filed by Naruto (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
July 11, 2016 Filing 51 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Matthew Daniel Strugar (Strugar, Matthew) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
March 22, 2016 Filing 50 USCA Case Number 16-15469 for #48 Notice of Appeal, filed by Naruto. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 21, 2016 Filing 49 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding: COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 20, 2016 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Naruto. Re #45 Order; #47 Judgment; (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-10303537 paid.) (Schwarz, David) (Filed on 3/20/2016) Modified on 3/21/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2016: #1 USCA Number: 16-15469) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2016 Filing 47 JOINT STIPULATION AND JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/18/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 17, 2016 Filing 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #45 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Stipulation and [Proposed] Final Judgment filed by Naruto. (Schwarz, David) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge William H. Orrick granting #24 Motion to Dismiss and #28 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendants' motions to dismiss are GRANTED. Any amended complaint should be filed within 20 days of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
January 22, 2016 Filing 44 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/06/2016, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 2:30 p.m. - 2:54 p.m. = 24 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #42 Transcript Order, #43 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 2/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2016. (Related documents(s) #42 , #43 ) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 19, 2016 Filing 43 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Naruto for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Schwarz, David) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 15, 2016 Filing 42 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Blurb, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 6, 2016 Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 1/6/2016 re #24 MOTION to Dismiss and #28 MOTION to Dismiss. Motions taken under submission; written order to follow. FTR Time 2:30-2:54. Plaintiff Attorney David A. Schwarz and Jeffrey Kerr. Defendant Attorneys Angela Dunning, Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria, and Andrew Dhuey. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/6/2016)
December 30, 2015 Filing 40 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [PROPOSED] ORDER; filed by Naruto. (Schwarz, David) (Filed on 12/30/2015) Modified on 1/4/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2015 Filing 39 REPLY (re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byDavid John Slater, Wildlife Personalities, Ltd.. (Dhuey, Andrew) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 18, 2015 Filing 38 Certificate of Interested Entities by Blurb, Inc. (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 18, 2015 Filing 37 REPLY (re #24 MOTION to Dismiss THE COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ) filed byBlurb, Inc.. (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 14, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by David Abba Schwarz (Schwarz, David) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 8, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Daniel Strugar (Strugar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 34 Declaration in Support of #33 Request for Judicial Notice, Declaration of Daniel Allender in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice filed byNaruto. (Related document(s) #33 ) (Schwarz, David) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 33 Request for Judicial Notice re #31 Opposition/Response to Motion, Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed byNaruto. (Related document(s) #31 ) (Schwarz, David) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 32 OBJECTIONS to re #26 Request for Judicial Notice Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant Blurb's Request for Judicial Notice by Naruto. (Schwarz, David) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 31 RESPONSE (re #24 MOTION to Dismiss THE COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) Plaintiffs' Combined Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed byNaruto. (Schwarz, David) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RE RESCHEDULING RULE 26(F) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #29 STIPULATION. Case Management Conference continued to 1/6/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco (Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2015.) Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/2/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
December 1, 2015 Filing 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #15 Case Management Scheduling Order, Joint Stipulation to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Naruto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Hultin, Casey) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
November 6, 2015 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by David John Slater, Wildlife Personalities, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 12/4/2015. Replies due by 12/18/2015. (Dhuey, Andrew) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 6, 2015 Filing 27 Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANT BLURB, INC. #24 MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT by Blurb, Inc.. (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 11/6/2015) Modified on 11/9/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2015 Filing 26 Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF #24 MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT filed byBlurb, Inc.. (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 11/6/2015) Modified on 11/9/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2015 Filing 25 Declaration of Angela L. Dunning in Support of #24 MOTION to Dismiss THE COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed byBlurb, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #24 ) (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 6, 2015 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss THE COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Blurb, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 12/4/2015. Replies due by 12/18/2015. (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey S. Kerr. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 5, 2015 Filing 22 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9854797.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/22/2015 filed by Naruto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Kerr, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/5/2015) Modified on 11/6/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #20 Stipulation Extending Deadlines re Motions to Dismiss. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 26, 2015 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER scheduling complaint responses filed by Naruto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Hultin, Casey) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 13, 2015 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by David John Slater, Wildlife Personalities, Ltd. (Dhuey, Andrew) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 13, 2015 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Naruto on Defendants Slater and Wildlife Personalities (Hultin, Casey) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 6, 2015 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Defendant Blurb, Inc.'s Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Blurb, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Angela L. Dunning)(Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 2, 2015 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Naruto on Defendant Blurb, Inc. (Hultin, Casey) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/15/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/25/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on September 25, 2015. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 25, 2015 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 24, 2015 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Naruto.. (Hultin, Casey) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 23, 2015 Filing 11 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
September 23, 2015 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Blurb, Inc., David John Slater, Wildlife Personalities, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
September 23, 2015 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/15/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
September 22, 2015 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015) Modified on 9/23/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2015 Filing 7 FEE PAID (Filing fee$400,receipt number 0971-9854797). (Hultin, Casey) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 22, 2015 Electronic filing error. Filing fee not paid. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701] Re: #1 Complaint filed by Naruto Case will not be randomly assigned judge until filing fee has been paid. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 21, 2015 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Next Friend People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals Inc. by Naruto. (Hultin, Casey) (Filed on 9/21/2015) Modified on 9/23/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2015 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Naruto (Hultin, Casey) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
September 21, 2015 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Hultin, Casey) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
September 21, 2015 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Hultin, Casey) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
September 21, 2015 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Hultin, Casey) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
September 21, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against All Defendants. Filed by Naruto. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hultin, Casey) (Filed on 9/21/2015) Modified on 9/23/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naruto v. David John Slater et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naruto
Represented By: David Abba Schwarz
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Kerr
Represented By: Casey Anne Hultin
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antje Engelhardt
Represented By: David Abba Schwarz
Represented By: Casey Anne Hultin
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blurb, Inc.
Represented By: Angela Lucille Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David John Slater
Represented By: Andrew John Dhuey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wildlife Personalities, Ltd.
Represented By: Andrew John Dhuey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?