United States of America v. Anderson
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Sigurd Anderson
Case Number: 3:2015cv04345
Filed: September 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by United States of America. Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 6, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Granting Petitioner United States of America's Petition to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 21, 2016. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Show Cause Hearing filed by United States of America. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/11/2016 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 17, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING SHOW CAUSE HEARING filed by United States of America. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/23/2016 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 23, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 28 MOTION Specific Ruling filed by Sigurd Anderson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 4, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/4/2016 at 2:00 PM. Opposition due by 3/9/2016. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 18, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER APPROVING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE re 22 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Sigurd Anderson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 8, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/22/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Michael G. Pitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigurd Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?