Regal Art & Gifts, Inc. v. Fusion Products, Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Regal Art & Gifts, Inc.
Defendant: Fusion Products, Ltd. and Menard, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04363
Filed: September 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Fusion Products, Ltd., Regal Art & Gifts, Inc., Menard, Inc., ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/12/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
April 8, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 24 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Fusion Products, Ltd., Menard, Inc. filed by Fusion Products, Ltd., Regal Art & Gifts, Inc., Menard, Inc., Case referred to mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/8/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
February 5, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by 5/16/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regal Art & Gifts, Inc. v. Fusion Products, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regal Art & Gifts, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart James West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fusion Products, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?