Koles v. YapStone, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jonathan Koles
Defendant: YapStone, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04429
Filed: September 25, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 57 Notice of Settlement and Stipulation to Lift Deadlines in Light of Proposed Settlement. Motion for preliminary approval due by 8/29/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 18, 2016. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
July 6, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 55 STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS 53 MOTION TO DISMISS AND 54 MOTION TO STRIKE. Responses due by 7/18/2016. Replies due by 8/4/2016. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/6/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
May 25, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 49 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/25/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
April 11, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 41 Stipulation for Seven-Day Extension of Time to Respond to Consolidated Complaint. Response due by April 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 11, 2016. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
February 8, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING: (29 in 4:15-cv-04429-JSW) (28 in 4:15-cv-05023-JSW) Motion to Consolidate Cases and Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 8, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
January 4, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED as to (30 in 4:15-cv-04429-JSW) STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER SHORTENING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ADVANCING HEARING and (29 in 4:15-cv-05023-JSW) STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER SHORTENING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ADVANCING HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/4/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
November 20, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 23 SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 20, 2015. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
October 20, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Case Management Statement due by 12/31/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/20/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koles v. YapStone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Koles
Represented By: Robert Ahdoot
Represented By: James A Barry
Represented By: Andrew P. Bell
Represented By: Michael Andrew Galpern
Represented By: Bradley K King
Represented By: Theodore W. Maya
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YapStone, Inc.
Represented By: Hsiao C. Mao
Represented By: Ronald Irvin Raether, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?