Macaraeg v. ABM Security Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Michael Macaraeg
Defendant: ABM Security Services, Inc. and ABM Onsite Services-West, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04470
Filed: September 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/17/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
January 4, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 23 to Continue Case Management Conference Deadline Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/4/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
November 23, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion to Transfer and Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/23/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
October 19, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Requesting Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion to Remand and Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/19/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macaraeg v. ABM Security Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Macaraeg
Represented By: Joseph Isaac Bautista
Represented By: Shannon Michele Seibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Security Services, Inc.
Represented By: Theane Evangelis Kapur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Onsite Services-West, Inc.
Represented By: Theane Evangelis Kapur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?