Sran v. Regents of the University of California

Plaintiff: Kulginder Sran
Defendant: Regents of the University of California
Case Number: 3:2015cv04471
Filed: September 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:794
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Expert Rebuttal and Expert Discovery Deadlines filed by Regents of the University of California. Expert Rebuttals due 6/16/2017. Expert Discovery Cutoff 6/30/2017. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 25, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
February 28, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Continuing Expert Disclosure and Expert Discovery Deadlines filed by Regents of the University of California. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 28, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
August 16, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Fact Discovery Deadline filed by Linda Centore, Regents of the University of California, Dorothy Perry. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
May 31, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Portions of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Linda Centore, Regents of the University of California, Dorothy Perry. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 31, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
April 6, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Portions of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof [FRCP12(b)(6)] filed by Kulginder Sran. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 6, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
March 21, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ADR ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 21, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
February 29, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Kulginder Sran. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 29, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
January 27, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings 5/12/2016. Fact discovery cut-off 10/14/2016. Expert disclosures 11/4/2016. Expert rebuttal 11/25/2016. Expert discovery cut-off 12/9/2016. Deadline to file dispositive motions 12/30/2016. Pretrial conference statement due 3/14/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 4/17/2017 - 5/20/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 27, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
December 29, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. ADR Deadline 1/8/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 29, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sran v. Regents of the University of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kulginder Sran
Represented By: Jay Toivo Jambeck
Represented By: Mandy G. Leigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regents of the University of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?