Eli E Garcia-v-MacDonald, et al

Defendant: Jim MacDonald
Petitioner: Eli E. Garcia
Case Number: 3:2015cv04484
Filed: September 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING RESPONDENT'S 45 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND 31 MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY THE HABEAS PETITION by Judge William H. Orrick. The Court will hold the evidentiary hearing on October 17th and 18th as scheduled to resolve the issue of juror bias. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
June 15, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 30 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER by Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
March 1, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTIONS FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND ORAL ARGUMENT AND DENYING IN PART PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS re: 23 MOTION for Oral Argument and 24 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing. Status Conference set for 3/14/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/01/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eli E Garcia-v-MacDonald, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eli E. Garcia
Represented By: James Scott Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?