Teachscape, Inc. et al v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al

Plaintiff: Teachscape, Inc. and Educational Impact
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America and Axis Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv04510
Filed: September 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4053
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2016 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 64 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying 63 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
November 22, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part 66 Defendant's Administrative Motion to Continue Discovery and Trial Preparation Deadlines. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
October 20, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America Discovery due by 11/12/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/20/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2016)
October 13, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE DISMISSAL (for Defendant Axis only) filed by Axis Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/13/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
June 13, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated Protective Order) filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/13/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 2, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying notice to appear by telephone re 50 Notice (Other) filed by Teachscape, Inc., Educational Impact. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/1/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
April 26, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 31 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
February 11, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE re 35 filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/10/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teachscape, Inc. et al v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teachscape, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Bernard
Represented By: Alan Lee Frank
Represented By: Paul Bradley Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Educational Impact
Represented By: Christopher Michael Bernard
Represented By: Alan Lee Frank
Represented By: Paul Bradley Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axis Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?