Frazier v. Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Kathy Frazier
Defendant: Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC and Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv04512
Filed: September 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 18 Motion to Transfer Case (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
December 30, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 25 Stipulation and Proposed Order. Case Management Conference set for 1/7/16 is hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/30/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
December 21, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND re 23 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/21/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
October 16, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 7 Order Reassigning Case. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2015. Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/16/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Frazier
Represented By: Suzanne Elaine Bish
Represented By: Darci Elaine Burrell
Represented By: Linda D. Friedman
Represented By: Sharon Rachel Vinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley
Represented By: Mark S. Dichter
Represented By: Daryl Steven Landy
Represented By: Blair J. Robinson
Represented By: Andrew J Schaffran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Dichter
Represented By: Daryl Steven Landy
Represented By: Blair J. Robinson
Represented By: Andrew J Schaffran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Dichter
Represented By: Daryl Steven Landy
Represented By: Blair J. Robinson
Represented By: Andrew J Schaffran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?