Thomas Lagos v. The Leland Stanford Junior University

Plaintiff: Thomas Lagos
Defendant: The Leland Stanford Junior University
Case Number: 3:2015cv04524
Filed: October 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2017 93 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO POSTPONE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Thomas Lagos, The Leland Stanford Junior University. Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2018 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/13/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 7, 2017 91 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 89 MOTION to Certify Class and supporting Memorandum filed by Thomas Lagos. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 89 MOTION to Certify Class and supporting Memorandum, 88 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 78 Case Management Conference - Further. Set Deadlines/Hearings . Motion to be filed by 1/5/2018. Opposition due by 1/30/2018. Replies due by 2/13/2018. Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/7/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
June 7, 2017 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 79 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
March 24, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 62 Motion for Preliminary Approval. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
February 17, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Supplemental Briefing on 62 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/17/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
July 20, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 41 Proposed Order filed by Thomas Lagos, The Leland Stanford Junior University. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/20/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
June 29, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Thomas Lagos, The Leland Stanford Junior University Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2016 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/29/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
June 14, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 6/28/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/5/2016 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/14/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
May 20, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 20, 2016, re 33 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
December 15, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 15, 2015, re 19 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 4, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 7 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas Lagos v. The Leland Stanford Junior University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lagos
Represented By: Lonnie Clifford Blanchard, III
Represented By: Peter Roald Dion-Kindem
Represented By: Jeffrey Durham Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Leland Stanford Junior University
Represented By: Michael Terence Lucey
Represented By: Maya Pri-Tal Ohana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?