Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. v. ASUSTeK Computer, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.,
Defendant: Asustek Computer, Inc. and ASUS Computer International
Mediator: Alexander L. Brainerd
Miscellaneous: David Keyzer
Case Number: 3:2015cv04525
Filed: October 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2017 409 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 394 Defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees Without Prejudice. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
November 21, 2016 376 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 374 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Grant Access to Sealed Transcript filed by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/21/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 3, 2016 354 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 304 Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (emclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
October 21, 2016 340 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and deferring in part 254 Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/21/2016. (emclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 18, 2016 327 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and deferring in part 256 Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (emclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 3, 2016 277 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER denying 276 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF filed by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/3/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
September 29, 2016 274 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 273 RESETTING MOTIONS HEARING FROM 11/3/16 to 11/2/16 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 273 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR ADMINISTR ATIVE RELIEF, 262 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Corrected 257 , 248 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendants' Affirmative Defense of License, 251 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony of Sach in Katti , 253 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Gregory C. Swinehart , 255 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Scott Acton Not Disclosed in Infringement Contentions , 250 MOTION Daubert Motion Seeking Exclusion of Testimony and Argument Conflicting with the Court's Claim Construction Order . Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/29/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
September 14, 2016 245 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Status Conference. Status Report due by 9/29/2016. Status Conference reset for 10/6/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 09/14/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
August 18, 2016 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying without prejudice 218 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions. The hearing on the motion is vacated. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
August 10, 2016 230 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 229 FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF, 218 MOTION for Sanctions Defendants' Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions. Motion Hearing reset for 9/15/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edwa rd M. Chen. Status Report due by 9/8/2016. Status Conference reset from 9/29/2106 to 9/15/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/10/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
July 5, 2016 212 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 209 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Judgment of Non-Infringement of the '730 Patent filed by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/5/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
May 27, 2016 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/27/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
April 25, 2016 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider 181 (Avago I); and Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Docket No. 16, C-16-0451] (Avago II). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/25/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
March 29, 2016 193 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 192 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED [PROPOSED] SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR THIRD PARTY QUALCOMM INCORPORATED filed by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/29/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
March 16, 2016 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying without prejudice 108 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying without prejudice 152 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 15, 2016 184 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 183 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 33 Protective Order SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES TECHNICAL DOCUMENTS AND SOURCE CODE filed by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/15/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 8, 2016 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 181 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration.(emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
February 25, 2016 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to submit declarations supporting Administrative Motions to Seal 108 , 152 . Defendants shall file responsive declarations consistent with Civil Local Rules 79-5(e)(1) and 79-5(d)(1)(A) by February 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/25/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
February 1, 2016 168 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 167 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 33 Protective Order SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR MICROSOFT TECHNICAL DOCUMENTS AND SOURCE CODE filed by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/1/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
January 28, 2016 166 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF AMENDED DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/28/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
January 11, 2016 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER resetting Claims Construction Hearing set from 5/2/2016 AND 5/3/2016 to 5/9/2016 at 01:00 PM, 5/10/2016 at 09:30 AM and 5/13/2016 09:30 AM if needed. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/11/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
December 30, 2015 154 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 150 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR ALL COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT THE JANUARY 5, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd. DENIED. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/30/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
December 14, 2015 147 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 146 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Administrative Relief filed by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.,, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 146 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Administ rative Relief, 97 MOTION for Leave to File Serve Amended Infringement Contentions. Motion Hearing reset for 1/21/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 11, 2015 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 132 Letter Rogatory (Mediatek) filed by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/10/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
December 10, 2015 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 122 Letter of Request filed by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/9/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 8, 2015 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CONSOLIDATED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULE. Tutorial Hearing set for 4/18/2016 at 02:30 PM and 4/19/2016 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/2/2016, 5/3/2016 and 5/6/2016 at 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/8/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
November 23, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 94 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (Unopposed) filed by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/20/15. Docket #101 filed in error. Please disregard #101.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
October 23, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue the Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2015. Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M.Chen on 10/23/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 19, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR BROADCOM TECHNICAL DOCUMENTS AND SOURCE CODE filed by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/19/15. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. v. ASUSTeK Computer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.,
Represented By: Robert John Artuz
Represented By: John David Cadkin
Represented By: Matthew C. Holohan
Represented By: Kristopher Lane Reed
Represented By: David E. Sipiora
Represented By: Daniel Shaw Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asustek Computer, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick John Flinn
Represented By: Sang Il Lee
Represented By: Christopher Louis McArdle
Represented By: Derek Scott Neilson
Represented By: Michael J Newton
Represented By: Michael John Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASUS Computer International
Represented By: Patrick John Flinn
Represented By: Sang Il Lee
Represented By: Christopher Louis McArdle
Represented By: Derek Scott Neilson
Represented By: Michael J Newton
Represented By: Michael John Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Alexander L. Brainerd
Represented By: Alexander L. Brainerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: David Keyzer
Represented By: David Michael Keyzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?