Tod Michael Schlesinger et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Tod Michael Schlesinger and Sean David Schlesinger
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04553
Filed: October 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/27/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
February 22, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for 3/4/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 2/22/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
January 8, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/28/2016 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 1/15/2016. The 1/14/2016 CMC is VACATED. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/8/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tod Michael Schlesinger et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Represented By: Mark Douglas Lonergan
Represented By: Mark Ian Wraight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tod Michael Schlesinger
Represented By: William E. Gilg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean David Schlesinger
Represented By: William E. Gilg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?