Camino Bell v. John Muir Health et al

Plaintiff: Camino Bell
Defendant: John Muir Health, Angela Percival and Sara Monahan
Case Number: 3:2015cv04564
Filed: October 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/14/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
November 7, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/12/2017 AT 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 1/5/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/7/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
October 5, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 29 REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE TO DECEMBER 5, 2016 AND EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINE TO JANUARY 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/5/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
May 13, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DATES. Jury Selection/Trial set for 5/8/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/13/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
January 21, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2016 at 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2017 10:00 AM; Jury Selection/Trial set for 2/27/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/21/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camino Bell v. John Muir Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camino Bell
Represented By: James Reed Rosen
Represented By: Joshua David Schein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Muir Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Percival
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?