Gardner v. Holland

Petitioner: Jonathan Micah Gardner
Respondent: Kim Holland
Case Number: 3:2015cv04695
Filed: October 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Kern
Referring Judge: PSLC CET
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
October 28, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
September 30, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TRAVERSE DEADLINE 20 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
January 26, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES 7 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
October 30, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 4 5 2 3 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jonathan Micah Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kim Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?