Johnson v. Sees Candies, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Sees Candies, Inc., Kenneth Sarachan and Laurie Browne
Case Number: 3:2015cv04708
Filed: October 12, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 20 Joint Notice of Settlement filed by Scott Johnson. Status Conference set for 6/9/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/5/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
March 14, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING STATUS UPDATE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/14/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
December 3, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Consent Substitution of Attorney filed by Sees Candies, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/3/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Sees Candies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr.
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Mark Dee Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sees Candies, Inc.
Represented By: Frances Hisako Yoshimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Sarachan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?