Van Fleet et al v. Trion Worlds, Inc.

Plaintiff: Aaron Van Fleet, Paul Ovberg and James Longfield
Defendant: Trion Worlds, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04721
Filed: October 13, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND, DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, AND DECLINING TO RULE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION Motions terminated: 26 , 29 . Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/12/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
January 4, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BLYTHE H. CHANDLER PRO HAC VICEPRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
December 29, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/29/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
November 20, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/20/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 17, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY TOBY J. MARSHALL PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
November 10, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY TOBY J. MARSHALL by Hon. William Alsup denying 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
October 28, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/2011. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Fleet et al v. Trion Worlds, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Van Fleet
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Adams
Represented By: Venkat Balasubramani
Represented By: Susan S. Brown
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Sean M. McChesney
Represented By: Karl Olson
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Ovberg
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Adams
Represented By: Venkat Balasubramani
Represented By: Susan S. Brown
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Sean M. McChesney
Represented By: Karl Olson
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Longfield
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Adams
Represented By: Venkat Balasubramani
Represented By: Susan S. Brown
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Sean M. McChesney
Represented By: Karl Olson
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trion Worlds, Inc.
Represented By: Behnam Dayanim
Represented By: John Paul Phillips
Represented By: Sophie J. Sung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?