Tradex Global Master Fund SPC Ltd et al v. Chui
Appellant: Tradex Global Master Fund SPC Ltd and Tradex Global Advisors LLC
Appellee: Benjamin Pui-Yun Chui
Case Number: 3:2015cv04744
Filed: October 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/30/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REQUESTING CHAMBERS COPIES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/19/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF by Hon. William Alsup granting 7 Ex Parte Application.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tradex Global Master Fund SPC Ltd et al v. Chui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Tradex Global Master Fund SPC Ltd
Represented By: Richard Adam Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Tradex Global Advisors LLC
Represented By: Richard Adam Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Benjamin Pui-Yun Chui
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Cantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?