Sangalang et al v. Bank of America N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Benigno Dizon Sangalang and Connie Cuaresma Sangalang
Defendant: Bank of America N.A., PRLAP Inc., M&T Bank, Bayview Loan Services LLC, Law Offices of Les Zieve and First American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv04752
Filed: October 14, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1443
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of voluntary dismissal. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/22/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
January 28, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DATE FOR FILING AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/28/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
January 7, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DENYING MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Case Management Conference previously set for 2/25/2016 Continued to 3/17/2016 11:00 AM to be held telephonically. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/7/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
January 5, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/5/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
October 29, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court *****DISREGARD ENTRY********** ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Hon. William H. Orrick no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/29/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015) Modified on 10/29/2015 (haS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/26/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sangalang et al v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benigno Dizon Sangalang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Cuaresma Sangalang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRLAP Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&T Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Les Zieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?