Joseph Baxter et al v. United States of America

Petitioner: Joseph Gary Baxter and Patricia Mary Baxter
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2015cv04764
Filed: October 15, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7609
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Alter Judgment. (ygrlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
February 26, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING; AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/26/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
February 8, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON FIRST AMENDED PETITION TO QUASH; RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY DENIAL OF FIRST AMENDED PETITION TO QUASH by Judge Yvonne Gonzale Rogers; granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion ; denying 16 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 7 Amended Petition ; Denying as Moot 20 Motion to Shorten Time. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
November 4, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 12/14/2015 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland, to be held together with Case Management Conference previously set in related case 15-cv-2138-YGR the same date and time. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/4/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
October 20, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re: Case No. 15-cv-02138-YGR. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/20/15. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph Baxter et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Gary Baxter
Represented By: Sara H. Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patricia Mary Baxter
Represented By: Sara H. Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Colin Christopher Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?