Rezvan v. Philips Electronics North America Corporation

Plaintiff: Layla Rezvan
Defendant: Philips Electronics North America Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv04767
Filed: October 15, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 21, 2016 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 94 PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO BRING VIDEO EQUIPMENT INTO COURT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 15, 2016 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS 40 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 13, 2016 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 88 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Leishman, David. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
November 18, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 55 Administrative Motion to submit newly released judicial opinion re 50 Opposition/Response to Motion. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
May 11, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice of discovery procedures. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/11/2016. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
February 16, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 31 Stipulated Protective Order for Standard Litigation (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
January 19, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/19/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
December 29, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
December 22, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 18 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
December 21, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Stipulation Selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
October 30, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/30/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rezvan v. Philips Electronics North America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Layla Rezvan
Represented By: Charles Jerome Wisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Electronics North America Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Killens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?