Heyward v. 24 Hours Fitness et al

Plaintiff: Marco B. Heyward
Defendant: 24 Hours Fitness and Tyler Eklund
Case Number: 3:2015cv04799
Filed: October 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/30/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 23, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/18/2016 02:00 PM.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/22/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
June 28, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2016 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 6/28/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heyward v. 24 Hours Fitness et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco B. Heyward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 24 Hours Fitness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Eklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?